skip to content

Perera, Clara Philomena

CPSO#: 30316

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jun 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 14-May-2014

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ceylon, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2006