skip to content

Pereira, Derek John

CPSO#: 92627

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 31 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General Hospital
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 32163
Fax: (416) 747-3611 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D. Pereira Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pereira ( CPSO# 92627 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General Hospital
Critical Care and Respirology
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Feb 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012 Active
 Dr. Derek John Pereira may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine
            as a Hospitalist, only.