skip to content

Peppin, Andrew Keith Harold

CPSO#: 89979

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Oct 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Dr East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: (905) 494-6614 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew Peppin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Peppin ( CPSO# 89979 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J6
Phone Number: (416) 712-1392

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW KEITH HAROLD PEPPIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEPPIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2008