Penhearow, Janie Catherine (CPSO#: 98396)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ardelt medical clinic
155 Ardelt ave
Kitchener ON  N2C 2E1
Phone: (519) 741-1717
Fax: (226)-475-0114
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janie Penhearow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Penhearow ( CPSO# 98396 )

Business Address:
155 Ardelt Avenue
Kitchener ON  N2C 2E1
Phone Number: (519) 741-1717

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANIE CATHERINE PENHEAROW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENHEAROW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015