skip to content

Pen, Visal

CPSO#: 85355

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cambodian, English, French

Education:Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Visal Pen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 16 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 2012