skip to content

Pema, Kesang

CPSO#: 95419

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Lady Hardinge Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 Francis St E
Fenelon Falls ON  K0M 1N0
Phone: (705) 887-5757
Fax: (705) 887-9499 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. K. Pema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pema ( CPSO# 95419 )

Business Address:
205 Francis Street East
Box 849
Fenelon Falls ON  K0M 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 887-4779

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KESANG PEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013