skip to content

Peltz, Sarah

CPSO#: 100394

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Division of Urology
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH PELTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELTZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018