skip to content

Peltekova, Iskra Todorova

CPSO#: 92942

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Feb 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Holland Bloorview Kids
Rehabilitation Hospital
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Phone: (416) 425-6220 Ext. 6343 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Developmental Paediatrics Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ISKRA TODOROVA PELTEKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELTEKOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2014 to 17 Oct 2014
Elective Trainee - Developmental Paediatrics

McMaster University, 04 May 2015 to 29 May 2015
Elective Trainee - Developmental Paediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2017