skip to content

Pelly, Lorine Patricia

CPSO#: 94687

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Mar 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Infectious Diseases
7th Floor Room 7315 Black Wing
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LORINE PATRICIA PELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2011 to 04 Feb 2011
EL - Pediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2013 to 16 Oct 2013
EL - Pediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2022