skip to content

Pelletier, Jean-Sebastien

CPSO#: 92260

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 16 Nov 2009 to 13 Dec 2009
EL - Critical Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 09 Jul 2012 to 22 Jul 2012
EL - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jul 2012