skip to content

Pelletier, Anne-Marie

CPSO#: 88846

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rideau Crossing FHC
90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville, ON
K0G 1J0
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-0100
Fax: 613 258-6171 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

2675 Concession Rd
Kemptville, ON
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Canada
Phone: 613 258-6133
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Anne-Marie Pelletier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pelletier ( CPSO# 88846 )

Business Address:
90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-0100

Business Address:
Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANNE-MARIE PELLETIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELLETIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2011