skip to content

Pelipyagina, Tetyana Oleksandrovna

CPSO#: 87801

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Kharkov Medical University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Core Family Health Centre
825 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H7
Phone: (519) 963-1875
Fax: (519) 963-1880 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tetyana Pelipyagina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Pelipyagina ( CPSO# 87801 )

Business Address:
Core Family Health Centre
825 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 963-1875

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TETYANA OLEKSANDROVNA PELIPYAGINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELIPYAGINA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2009