skip to content

Pelc, Jordan Ryan

CPSO#: 98182

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridgepoint
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone: 416 461-8252
Fax: 416 470-6692 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 596-4200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: 416 340-4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jordan Pelc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pelc ( CPSO# 98182 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Business Address:
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M6M 2Z7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8252

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JORDAN RYAN PELC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014