skip to content

Peerbaye, Goolam Hossen

CPSO#: 25248

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Yousouf Peerbaye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2013

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to access medical records may call Margaret at (416) 759-8631 or Dr. Peerbaye at (416) 383-9588.
Date Received: 08 Jan 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2013