skip to content

Peerani, Raheem

CPSO#: 98104

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Mar 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Hematopathology
2075 Bayview Ave
Room B204
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-480-6100
Fax: 416-480-6035 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Room 4SE-111
North York ON  M2K1E1
Canada
Phone: 416-756-6455
Fax: 416-756-4294
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. Peerani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Peerani ( CPSO# 98104 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Ave
Room B204
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: 416-480-6100

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Room 4SE-111
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6248

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAHEEM PEERANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEERANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2018