skip to content

Peer, Ismail Goolam Hoosen

CPSO#: 24494

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 135 - 2224 Walker Road Windsor ON N8W 5L7 Tel: 519-258-2261
Date Received: 18 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018