Peel, Alexandrea Christine (CPSO#: 97820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
271 Frances Street
P.O. Box 208
Wingham ON  N0G2W0
Phone: 519-357-2500
Fax: 519-357-1816
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 28 Feb 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDREA CHRISTINE PEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 13 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Nov 2017 to 28 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016