skip to content

Peebles, Erin Rachelle

CPSO#: 92042

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 May 2021
EXPIRY DATE
05 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Peebles Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Peebles ( CPSO# 92042 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences-Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
Room B1-168
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre, Health Records 800 Commissioners Rd. East, London ON N6A 5W9
Date Received: 05 May 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2009 to 25 Sep 2009
EL - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 07 Mar 2011 to 04 Apr 2011
EL - Paediatric Critical Care

University Of Toronto, 26 Sep 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
EL - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 24 Oct 2011 to 18 Nov 2011
EL - Paediatric Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 May 2021