skip to content

Pease, Christopher Andrew

CPSO#: 98010

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-722-7000
Fax: 613-737-8537 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:06 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANDREW PEASE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEASE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 16 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2017