skip to content

Peacock, Sharon

CPSO#: 95344

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sinai Health System
600 University Ave
Anesthesia Department
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

600-340 College St
Kensington Eye Institute
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sharon Peacock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Peacock ( CPSO# 95344 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
19 - 104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:31 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHARON PEACOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEACOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017