skip to content

Payton, Keith Bramwell

CPSO#: 31017

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Apr 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Keith Payton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 25 2019

Medical Records Location

Instructions: After June 30, 2018 medical records for Dr. Payton will be stored at: Command Services London (Ltd) 100 Piccadilly St London, ON N6A 1R8 Phone: 519-672-1460
Date Received: 28 May 2018


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective:03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Apr 2019