skip to content

Payne, Michael Kenneth

CPSO#: 94995

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Mar 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C Victoria Hospital
Division of Microbiology
800 Commmissioners Road E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: 519-646-6002 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Payne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Payne ( CPSO# 94995 )

Business Address:
L H S C Victoria Hospital
Division of Microbiology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
50 King Street
London ON  N6A 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 663-5446


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL KENNETH PAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAYNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 08 May 2011 to 30 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2018