skip to content

Pawliwec, Walter Joseph

CPSO#: 27869

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Sep 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Ukrainian

Education:McGill University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
200 Terrace Hill
Brantford ON  N3R-7S9
Phone: 519 751-2365 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Walter Pawliwec Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Pawliwec ( CPSO# 27869 )

Business Address:
The Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Business Address:
Medical Arts Building
353 St Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Phone Number: (519) 751-2340

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  January 10, 2020
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On February 4, 2020, Brant Community Healthcare System (BCHS) notified the College, pursuant to s.33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective January 10, 2020, Dr. Pawliwec has agreed to restrict his practice at BCHS to Surgical Assisting

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 11, 2019
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On November 11, 2019, Brant Community Healthcare System (BCHS) notified the College, pursuant to s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.2(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code,Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Pawliwec has, pending the outcome of an external review of his Surgical Services, voluntarily agreed not to provide any Surgical Services at BCHS except for the following Surgical Services:

- Surgical Assisting
- Ambulatory Care Clinic ("Lumps and Bumps"); and
- Hernia Repair Surgeries (as well as Major Skin Surgeries) in the Operating Room

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 25 Mar 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 25 Mar 2020 Active
             As from March 25, 2020, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Walter Joseph
            Pawliwec in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Pawliwec to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. WALTER JOSEPH PAWLIWEC
                                          ("Dr. Pawliwec")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                                                                                     

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Pawliwec, certificate of registration number 27869, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Pawliwec, acknowledge that the College received information about
                  my surgical practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Pawliwec, acknowledge that I currently practise only at Brantford
                  Community Healthcare System (BCHS).

            (5)   I, Dr. Pawliwec, acknowledge that I do not practise at any practice
                  location, including but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics and
                  offices, in any jurisdiction, nor am I affiliated with any Independent
                  Health Facility in any jurisdiction, other than BCHS (collectively, my
                  "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), nor do I have privileges at
                  any other hospital whatsoever.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (6)   I, Dr. Pawliwec, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (7)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pawliwec, undertake that I shall not engage in the practice
                        of medicine as the Most Responsible Physician for any patient
                        whatsoever.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pawliwec, undertake that the entirety of my scope of
                        practice will be limited in the following ways:
                  
                        (i)   I shall only practise medicine as a surgical assistant of a
                              surgeon:
                  
                              1.    certified by the Royal College of Physicians and
                                    Surgeons or recognized as a surgical specialist by the
                                    College; and
                  
                              2.    who holds privileges at BCHS, or other Practice
                                    Location as may be approved by the College,
                  
                                    (collectively, a "Qualified Surgeon"); and
                  
                        (ii)  for further clarity, but without limiting the generality of
                              section (7)(b)(i) above:
                  
                              1.    I will not provide any pre-operative or post-operative
                                    care whatsoever; and
                  
                              2.    a Qualified Surgeon must always be physically in
                                    attendance when I am engaging in my practice as a
                                    surgical assistant.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Pawliwec, undertake that I will not engage in any practice
                        of medicine that is not expressly and specifically listed in
                        section (7)(b) above.
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Pawliwec, undertake that I will not commence surgical assisting at
                  any other Practice Location (other than BCHS) without prior approval of
                  the College. Should I seek privileges to perform surgical assisting at
                  any other Practice Location (other than BCHS), I shall advise the College
                  within five (5) days of making such application, and shall seek approval
                  to practice surgical assisting at the Practice Location at least fourteen
                  (14) days before I plan to commence surgical assisting at that location.

            (9)   Compliance and Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pawliwec, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pawliwec, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Pawliwec, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and/or
                        patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Pawliwec, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Closing a
                  Medical Practice.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Pawliwec, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Pawliwec, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Pawliwec, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Pawliwec, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Qualified Surgeon and any Chief of Staff, or a
                  colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief
                  of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Pawliwec, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (16)  I, Dr. Pawliwec, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pawliwec, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pawliwec, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (19)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Information was received about Dr. Pawliwec's surgical
                              practice and as a result, Dr. Pawliwec has voluntary
                              restricted his practise to surgical assistant under the
                              direction of a qualified surgeon. Further, Dr. Pawliwec has
                              agreed to not commence surgical assisting at any other
                              Practice Location (other than BCHS) without prior approval of
                              the College.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Pawliwec, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Qualified Surgeons and all Chiefs of Staff with any of the following: 

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking; 
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Pawliwec, give my irrevocable consent to all Qualified Surgeons
                  and all Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another,
                  all information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the
                  purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 25, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Walter Joseph Pawliwec to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 25, 2020:

Information was received about Dr. Pawliwec’s surgical practice and as a result, Dr. Pawliwec has voluntary restricted his practise to surgical assistant under the direction of a qualified surgeon. Further, Dr. Pawliwec has agreed to not commence surgical assisting at any other Practice Location (other than BCHS) without prior approval of the College.