skip to content

Pawa, Jasmine

CPSO#: 97770

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o The Station
401 Richmond St. W
Suite LL01
Toronto ON  M5V 3A8
Phone: 647-874-2824 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective:15 Aug 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JASMINE PAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University Of Toronto, 16 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014