Paventi Douglas, Alexandra Lindsay (CPSO#: 100795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Aug 2017

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Electoral District: 04

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 09 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 08 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 09 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 08 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 09 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 08 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 09 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 May 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 08 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr. Alexandra Lindsay Paventi Douglas shall practise medicine as required
                  by  the  postgraduate  medical  education  program  in  which Dr. Paventi
                  Douglas is enrolled at McMaster University.

            (2)   In  Dr.  Paventi Douglas' practice in the postgraduate medical  education
                  program, Dr.   Paventi Douglas shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients
                  or out-patients  of  a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated
                  with the department where  Dr.  Paventi  Douglas  is  properly practising
                  medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the
                  department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In  Dr.  Paventi Douglas' practice in the postgraduate medical  education
                  program, Dr. Paventi Douglas shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. Paventi  Douglas  may  practise  psychiatry  and to the extent of her
                  employment  at  Cambridge  Memorial  Hospital,  while  under  supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            (5)   In Dr. Paventi Douglas' practice specified in paragraph  (4), Dr. Paventi
                  Douglas may not charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This  certificate of registration expires, and Dr. Paventi  Douglas  must
                  thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical
                  education program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when  Dr.  Paventi  Douglas  is  no longer enrolled in a program of
                        postgraduate medical education provided  by  a  medical  school  in
                        Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when  Dr.  Paventi  Douglas  no  longer holds Canadian citizenship,
                        permanent  resident  status,  or a valid  employment  authorization
                        under the Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically  converts   to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education certificate and Dr.  Paventi Douglas must immediately cease all
                  practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of
                  the following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisor identified in paragraph (4)  notifies the College of
                        any concerns regarding Dr. Paventi Douglas' practice, including but
                        not  limited to concerns regarding knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Paventi Douglas' practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval for Dr.  Paventi Douglas to engage in practice outside the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when  Dr. Paventi Douglas' employment as specified in paragraph (4)
                        ceases; or
                  
                  (e)   if Dr.  Paventi  Douglas  takes a leave of absence, or transfers to
                        another program, from the postgraduate  education program specified
                        in paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In   the  event  of  conversion  to  a  regular  Postgraduate   Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7)  or  expiry  of  the certificate under
                  paragraph  (7), Dr. Paventi Douglas may not resume any  practice  outside
                  the  postgraduate   medical   education   program  under  the  restricted
                  registration for residents policy until Dr. Paventi Douglas applies for a
                  new certificate of registration and obtains  approval by the Registration
                  Committee.



            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  August 4, 2017.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraph 6(a), this certificate of  registration  expires  on  June  30,
                  2019.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice   outside   the  postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.