skip to content

Paul, Margaret Ellen

CPSO#: 28020

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 06 Jan 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Jan 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Margaret Paul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 8 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: J.E.Y.'S Business Record Storage 871 Jet Ave North Bay ON P1B 2W9
Date Received: 24 Jan 2020


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1974
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jan 2020