skip to content

Hannam, Paul Davidson

CPSO#: 73694

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of 16 Jul 2022
EXPIRY DATE
16 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 16-Jul-2022

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Hannam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hannam ( CPSO# 73694 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General and
Orthopaedic Hospital Inc
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 16 Jul 2022