skip to content

Patt, Norman Leon

CPSO#: 15413

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Sep 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Sep 1955

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr Norm Patt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 19 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Oshawa Clinic 117 King St E Oshawa ON L1H 1B9 Tel: 905-721-4300
Date Received: 17 Jul 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:14 Nov 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 2018