skip to content

Patroi, Anca

CPSO#: 87293

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Bucharest, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton Family Care Centre
820 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 0J4
Phone: (905) 864-9898
Fax: 905 864 9393 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Anca Patroi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patroi ( CPSO# 87293 )

Business Address:
Milton Family Care Centre
820 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 0J4
Phone Number: (905) 864-9898

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANCA PATROI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATROI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2011