Patro, Satya Narayana (CPSO#: 98910)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Maharaja Krishna Chandra Gajapati Medica, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 25 Aug 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2016