skip to content

Patriquin, Christopher Jordan

CPSO#: 89380

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8N-889, Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-3999
Fax: 416-340-3348 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ananda Ghosh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Patriquin ( CPSO# 89380 )
Dr. A. Ghosh ( CPSO# 90549 )

Business Address:
416 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 844-5346

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JORDAN PATRIQUIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATRIQUIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2013