skip to content

Paterson, Nicole Dianne

CPSO#: 95021

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Centre for Fertility and Reproductive Health Suite 700 250 Dundas Street West Toronto, Ontario, Canada M5T 2Z5
Date Received: 02 Dec 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Oncology Effective:30 Nov 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 23 May 2011 to 03 Jun 2011
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Dec 2014