skip to content

Patel, Yatri Kiritkumar

CPSO#: 93597

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Algonquin College Student Health Services 1385 Woodroffe Ave Nepean, ON K2G 3G7
Date Received: 25 Jul 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Sep 2015 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

Western University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 22 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2019