skip to content

Patel, Vishnuprasad Keshavlal

CPSO#: 27660

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Dec 2021
EXPIRY DATE
22 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Dec 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education: Gujarat University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orleans Urgent Care Centre
100 - 1220 Place D'Orleans Drive
Orléans ON  K1C 7K3 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Orleans Urgent Care Clinic
100 - 1201 Place D'Orleans Drive
Orléans ON  K1C 7K5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2021
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 22 Jun 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Dec 2021 Active
 1. Dr. Vishnuprasad Keshavlal Patel may practice medicine independently in family medicine.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires 18 months from the date of issuance.

Note: This certificate is issued on 23 December, 2021. In accordance with paragraph 2 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 22 June, 2023.