skip to content

Patel, Vinodbhai Ramanbhai

CPSO#: 100774

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Jun 2013
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Government Medical College, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glenridge Medical Building
Suite 202
1 Belton Blvd.
St Catharines ON  L2T 3Y4
Phone: 905-682-8369
Fax: 905-682-0559 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vinodbhai Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Patel ( CPSO# 100774)

Business Address:
Glenridge Medical Building
Suite 202
1 Belton Boulevard
St Catharines ON  L2T 3Y4
Phone Number: (905) 682-8369


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jun 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2016

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2016 Active
                   Dr.  Vinodbhai  Ramanbhai  Patel  may  practise medicine independently in
                  family medicine.