skip to content

Patel, Tejal

CPSO#: 87308

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Family Practice
100 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone: 905 546 9885
Fax: 905 972 8903 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tejal Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 10 2011
Corporation Name: Dr. Tejal Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Patel ( CPSO# 87308 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
McMaster Family Practice
100 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1H6
Phone Number: (905) 546-9885

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TEJAL PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2009