skip to content

Patel, Sunil Vijay

CPSO#: 91460

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Burr 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 7995 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sunil Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Patel ( CPSO# 91460 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:13 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUNIL VIJAY PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 13 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 13 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015