Patel, Sanjay (CPSO#: 98901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
Division of General Surgery
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3269
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJAY PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017