skip to content

Patel, Rikin K

CPSO#: 94781

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Apr 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:St. George's University School of Medici, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7013
Fax: 416-281-7102 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Kids Clinic
Unit 306
6633 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3P 7C2
Canada
Phone: 289-554-1762
Fax: 289-554-1765
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rikin Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:18 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RIKIN K PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 07 Feb 2011 to 06 Mar 2011
EL - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 02 May 2011 to 28 May 2011
EL - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2015