skip to content

Patel, Neeraj

CPSO#: 98067

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Huron Medical Centre
23 Huron St W
Exeter, ON
N0M 1S2
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone: 519-235-3343
Fax: 519-235-3845 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Family Medical Centre
346 Platts Lane
London, ON
N6G 1J1
London ON  N6G1J1
Canada
Phone: 519-672-9660
Fax: 519-672-7727
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEERAJ PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014