skip to content

Patel, Krupal Bhupendrabhai

CPSO#: 98326

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KRUPAL BHUPENDRABHAI PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018