Patel, Kavita Girish (CPSO#: 100763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone: 647-722-2370
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

561 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON  M5N 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 551-7606
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.G. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Patel ( CPSO# 100763)

Business Address:
561 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 551-7606

Business Address:
2025 Midland Avenue
Suite 100
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone Number: (641) 722-2370

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Aug 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAVITA GIRISH PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2015