skip to content

Patel, Joan Susan

CPSO#: 31555

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 29 Mar 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Jun 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Susan Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Whitehills Medical Centre 1225 Wonderland Road North London ON N6G 2V9
Date Received: 27 Mar 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Mar 2018