skip to content

Patel, Jayesh

CPSO#: 84753

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 250
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 815-0755
Fax: (905) 815-0757 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

HALTON HEALTHCARE SERVICES
OAKVILLE TRAFALGAR MEMORIAL HOSPITA
3001 HOSPITAL GATE
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: 9058452571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

WEST GTA ENDOSCOPY
2225 ERIN MILLS PARKWAY SUITE 183
Mississauga ON  L5K1T9
Canada
Phone: 9058230223
Fax: 9058239780
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jayesh Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Patel ( CPSO# 84753 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
250 - 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 815-0755

Business Address:
West GTA Endoscopy
183 - 2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Phone Number: (905) 823-0223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAYESH PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2010