skip to content

Patel, Jayanti Bhogilal

CPSO#: 32106

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Gujarat University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Patel & T. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Appletree Medical Clinic York University Unit 28 4700 Keele Street Tel: (416) 479-8649 Fax: (416) 736-5523
Date Received: 30 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017