skip to content

Patel, Harshna

CPSO#: 84889

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
412-4040 Finch Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 613-5897
Fax: (416) 510-6951 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Harshna Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Patel ( CPSO# 84889 )

Business Address:
412 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 613-5897

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HARSHNA PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010