skip to content

Patel, Harshadrai Manibhai

CPSO#: 22556

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Feb 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kennedy/Sheppard Diagnostic
4002 Sheppard Ave. E
Suite 304
Scarborough ON  M1S 1S6
Phone: (416) 299-9895 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

East York Diagnostic Ultrasound
45 Overlea Blvd.
Suite A8
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 421-5065
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. H.M. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HARSHADRAI MANIBHAI PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1970