skip to content

Patel, Hareshkumar Vitthalbhai

CPSO#: 85407

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Gujarat University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 12 Jul 2006 to 14 Aug 2006
PEAP - CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 15 Aug 2006 to 14 Aug 2007
CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 15 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2009