skip to content

Patel, Ashish Devendra

CPSO#: 97542

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905 883 1212 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lawrence Park Cardiology
3080 Yonge St #4022
Toronto Ontario
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Canada
Phone: (647) 347 6644
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Vaughan Diagnostic & Cardiac Clinic
2640 Rutherford Road
Suite 102
Vaughan ON  L4K0H3
Canada
Phone: 905 417 3001
Fax: 905 417 3006
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ashish Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patel ( CPSO# 97542 )

Business Address:
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: 905 883 1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASHISH DEVENDRA PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Jul 2020
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2016