skip to content

Patel, Alkesh

CPSO#: 89180

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Sep 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University College, Cork, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5220 Dundas Street
Units D9-D11
Burlington ON  L7L 0J4
Phone: 289-337-3090
Fax: 289-337-1320 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

2100 Bovaird Dr. E
Burlington ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Alkesh Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patel ( CPSO# 89180 )

Business Address:
Suite D9-D11
5220 Dundas Street
Burlington ON  L7L 0J4
Phone Number: (289) 337-3090


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective:20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALKESH PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2015